US HB1241 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-18)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the tax exclusion for tax benefits and qualified payments provided to volunteer firefighters and emergency medical providers by a state or local government to (1) increase the dollar limitation for qualified payments, and (2) make the tax exclusion permanent. (Under current law, the exclusion expired at the end of 2010.)
Title
Volunteer Responder Incentive Protection Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1007 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1994 (Related) 2019-06-03 - Received in the Senate.
SB1210 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR389 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1994 (Related) 2019-06-03 - Received in the Senate.
SB1210 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR389 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Health personnel
Income tax exclusion
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
Taxation
Employee benefits and pensions
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Health personnel
Income tax exclusion
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1241/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1241/BILLS-116hr1241ih.pdf |