US HB1248 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 496.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 496.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates specified segments of the main stem and the tributaries of Bass Cove Creek, Cider Hill Creek, Cutts Ridge Brook, Dolly Gordon Brook, Libby Brook, Rogers Brook, and Smelt Brook of the York River in Maine as a recreational river. The Department of the Interior may enter into cooperative agreements to provide for the long-term protection, preservation, and enhancement of the river segments. No land or interest in land within the watersheds of the river segments may be acquired by condemnation.
Title
York River Wild and Scenic River Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 496. |
2020-11-27 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-603. |
2020-09-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-30 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2019-05-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4938 (Related) 2020-12-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Maine
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Maine
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats