US HB1250 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-13)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-55. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-13)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-55. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 11158 Highway 146 North in Hardin, Texas, as the "Lucas Lowe Memorial Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 11158 Highway 146 North in Hardin, Texas, as the "Lucas Lowe Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] |
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] | Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] |
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] |
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] |
Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX] |
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] |
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] |
Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-55. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-08-23 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-08-13 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-07-30 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-07-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5204) |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-07-17 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5953-5954) |
2019-07-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1250. |
2019-07-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5953-5954) |
2019-07-17 | House | Mr. Rouda moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-06-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-06-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Texas
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Texas