US HB1264 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain payment information relating to covered drugs under the Medicare prescription drug benefit and Medicaid to be disclosed to additional entities. Specifically, certain subsidy and rebate information, as reported by prescription drug plan sponsors and drug manufacturers, may be disclosed to the Medicare Payment Advisory Commission and the Medicaid and Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP) Payment and Access Commission, in accordance with specified confidentiality restrictions.
Title
Payment Commission Data Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1781 (Same As) 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB801 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2543 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 225.
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB3129 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4199 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4228)
SB801 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2543 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 225.
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB3129 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4199 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4228)
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Medicaid
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Medicaid
Medicare
Prescription drugs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1264/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1264/BILLS-116hr1264ih.pdf |