US HB129 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits Members of Congress from being paid in a fiscal year until both chambers approve the budget resolution and pass all regular appropriations bills for that fiscal year. Retroactive pay is prohibited for such a period.
Title
No Budget, No Pay Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] |
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK] |
Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB39 (Same As) 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB3267 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB3267 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget process
Congress
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Legislative rules and procedure
Members of Congress
Budget process
Congress
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Legislative rules and procedure
Members of Congress
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/129/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr129/BILLS-116hr129ih.pdf |