US HB1305 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes eligible under the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) homeless veterans reintegration program those homeless veterans who are: (1) participating in the VA supported housing program for which rental assistance is provided under the United States Housing Act of 1937, and (2) veterans who are transitioning from being incarcerated.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide clarification regarding eligibility for services under the Homeless Veterans Reintegration Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2013-04-25 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-04-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-04-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2013-03-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1305/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1305/BILLS-113hr1305ih.pdf |