US HB1310 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds the Rural Development Voucher Program to the list of covered housing programs under the Violence Against Women Act of 1994 (VAWA). Specifically, it extends VAWA's housing protections (e.g., protection from eviction or denial of housing) to residents and applicants under the Rural Development Voucher Program who are victims of domestic violence, dating violence, sexual assault, or stalking.
Title
VAWA Protections for Rural Women Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] |
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3620 (Related) 2019-09-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB5038 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB4916 (Related) 2019-11-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB5038 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB4916 (Related) 2019-11-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Domestic violence and child abuse
Housing and community development funding
Low- and moderate-income housing
Rural conditions and development
Sex offenses
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Domestic violence and child abuse
Housing and community development funding
Low- and moderate-income housing
Rural conditions and development
Sex offenses
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1310/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1310/BILLS-116hr1310ih.pdf |