US HB1315 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Blue Collar to Green Collar Jobs Development Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Blue Collar to Green Collar Jobs Development Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
2019-05-16HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-10HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-23HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-22HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback