US HB1316 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Sets forth the responsibilities of each Director and Assistant Director of Veterans' Employment and Training (assigned to each state by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs [VA] from among personnel within the Veterans' Employment and Training Service), including: (1) monitoring the performance of veterans' training and employment programs, with special emphasis on services to disabled veterans; (2) addressing performance deficiencies and establishing higher performance goals; (3) reviewing program funding and assisting with funding requests; and (4) conducting outreach to inform employers of their rights and responsibilities with respect to the hiring of veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend title 38, United States Code, to specify the responsibilities of the Directors and Assistant Directors of Veterans' Employment and Training.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-25HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2013-04-25HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2013-04-10HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2013-04-02HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
2013-03-21HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2013-03-21HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E355-356)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback