US HB1316 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Veterans' Heritage Firearms Act of 2015 Provides a 90-day amnesty period during which veterans and their family members can register in the National Firearms Registration and Transfer Record any firearm acquired before October 31, 1968, by a veteran while a member of the Armed Forces stationed outside the continental United States. Grants such an individual limited immunity under the federal criminal code and the Internal Revenue Code with respect to the acquisition, possession, transportation, or alteration of such firearm before or concurrent with such registration. Extends such immunity to a veteran who attempts to register a qualifying firearm outside of the amnesty period if the veteran surrenders the firearm within 30 days after being notified of potential criminal liability for continued possession. Requires the Attorney General to provide clear notice of, and the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out an outreach program and develop a communications strategy to provide veterans information regarding, the amnesty and registration period. Requires the Attorney General to: (1) transfer each firearm qualifying as a curio or relic that has been forfeited to the United States to the first qualified museum that requests it, and (2) publish information identifying each such firearm that is available to be transferred to a museum. Prohibits the Attorney General from destroying any such firearm that has been forfeited until five years after the forfeiture. Requires that any firearm transferred to a qualified museum be registered to the transferee. Makes a prohibition against transfer or possession of a machine-gun inapplicable to a transfer to or by, or possession by, a museum that is open to the public and incorporated as a not-for-profit corporation under applicable state law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans' Heritage Firearms Act of 2015

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-31HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
2015-03-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
2015-03-04HouseReferred to House Veterans' Affairs
2015-03-04HouseReferred to House Ways and Means
2015-03-04HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2015-03-04HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2015-03-04HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB670 (Same As) 2015-03-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback