US HB1322 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 60.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 60.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the U.S. Coast Guard to submit a report on the vulnerabilities of Coast Guard installations as a result of climate change over the next 20 years, including an overview of mitigations that may be necessary to ensure the continued operational viability of the vulnerable installations.
Title
To require a report on the effects of climate change on the Coast Guard, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 60. |
2019-05-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-85. |
2019-03-27 | House | Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged. |
2019-03-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1922 (Related) 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 559.
HB3409 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2153 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2297 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 226.
HB3409 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2153 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2297 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 226.
Subjects
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coast guard
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government studies and investigations
Transportation and public works
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coast guard
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government studies and investigations
Transportation and public works