US HB1324 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies requirements governing the national instant criminal background check system (NICS). Specifically, it requires the NICS to query an additional database—the National Data Exchange—as part of a firearm-related background check.
Title
FAST NICS Act FBI Access to Speedy Technology NICS Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2319 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB5949 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3815 (Related) 2020-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5949 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3815 (Related) 2020-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Firearms and explosives
Government information and archives
Criminal justice information and records
Firearms and explosives
Government information and archives
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1324/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1324/BILLS-116hr1324ih.pdf |