US HB133 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

United States-Mexico Economic Partnership Act This bill directs the Department of State to develop a strategy to enhance economic cooperation and expand professional and educational exchange programs between the United States and Mexico. The State Department shall develop strategies to encourage more academic exchanges between the countries, as well as exchanges to encourage strengthening business skills and entrepreneurship. The State Department shall also promote energy infrastructure coordination and educational development, particularly in the region near the Eagle Ford Shale. It shall also assess ways to develop partnerships between the countries' medical and nursing schools. The plan should ensure that accreditation standards for such schools are comparable so that students in Mexico can pass the licensing exams needed to practice in the United States. These programs shall be focused on the region within 100 kilometers of the U.S.-Mexico border.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States-Mexico Economic Partnership Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-11SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2019-01-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-01-10HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H430-431)
2019-01-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 133.
2019-01-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H430-432)
2019-01-10HouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB587 (Related) 2019-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback