US HB1332 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fair Care Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Care Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-02-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
2019-02-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, Rules, the Budget, Armed Services, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, Rules, the Budget, Armed Services, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, Rules, the Budget, Armed Services, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, Rules, the Budget, Armed Services, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, Rules, the Budget, Armed Services, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, Rules, the Budget, Armed Services, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, Rules, the Budget, Armed Services, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, Rules, the Budget, Armed Services, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, Rules, the Budget, Armed Services, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-02-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB506 (Related) 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB789 (Related) 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB803 (Related) 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB856 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1035 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB92 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB350 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB988 (Related) 2019-04-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1922 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3062 (Related) 2019-06-03 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects

Abortion
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Income tax deductions
Judicial review and appeals
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Sales and excise taxes
State and local finance
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Tax-exempt organizations
Tax-exempt organizations
Women's health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback