US HB1336 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the federal government to ensure that children who are separated from their parents at the border by the Department of Homeland Security receive mental health services for free, including a mental health assessment within 24 hours of such separation and annually thereafter, as needed. Children who have already been separated (since April 6, 2018) must receive a mental health assessment within 24 hours after enactment of this bill.
Title
Mental Health Care for Children Inhumanely Separated from Parents by the Federal Government Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Child health
Detention of persons
Family relationships
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Immigration status and procedures
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Child health
Detention of persons
Family relationships
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Immigration status and procedures
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1336/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1336/BILLS-116hr1336ih.pdf |