US HB1344 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit brand name drug companies from compensating generic drug companies to delay the entry of a generic drug into the market, and for other purposes.
Title
Competitive DRUGS Act of 2019 Competitive Deals Resulting in Unleashed Generics and Savings Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] |
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law. |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2375 (Related) 2020-12-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 576.
SB64 (Related) 2019-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB64 (Related) 2019-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Business expenses
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Health
Income tax deductions
Intellectual property
Judicial review and appeals
Marketing and advertising
Prescription drugs
Research and development
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Business expenses
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Health
Income tax deductions
Intellectual property
Judicial review and appeals
Marketing and advertising
Prescription drugs
Research and development
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1344/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1344/BILLS-116hr1344ih.pdf |