US HB1346 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a Medicare buy-in option for certain qualifying individuals and makes a series of other changes relating to health care costs. Specifically, the bill allows individuals aged 50 to 64 to enroll in Medicare if such individuals would otherwise qualify for Medicare at the age of 65. The Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) must determine enrollment periods and set premiums for the buy-in option established under the bill, in accordance with specified requirements. The CMS must also award grants to states and nonprofit organizations for outreach and enrollment activities relating to the buy-in option. The bill also (1) establishes a supplemental option under Medicare to cover cost-sharing for beneficiaries; (2) repeals provisions that prohibit the CMS from negotiating the prices of prescription drugs; and (3) establishes an individual market reinsurance program relating to coverage of high-cost individuals, as specified.
Title
Medicare Buy-In and Health Care Stabilization Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB275 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB470 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB964 (Related) 2019-04-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4652 (Related) 2019-10-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB470 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB964 (Related) 2019-04-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4652 (Related) 2019-10-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Income tax credits
Inflation and prices
Insurance industry and regulation
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
State and local government operations
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Income tax credits
Inflation and prices
Insurance industry and regulation
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1346/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1346/BILLS-116hr1346ih.pdf |