US HB1354 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-3)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alters provisions under Medicaid, Medicare, and Medicare Advantage relating to U.S. territories, and generally modifies and establishes programs to expand health insurance coverage for residents. Among other things, the bill eliminates Medicaid funding limitations for U.S. territories beginning in FY2020; repeals provisions that exclude residents of Puerto Rico from a certain automatic enrollment process for Medicare medical services; establishes minimum criteria for certain elements used in Medicare Advantage payment calculations for areas within U.S. territories; and allows residents of U.S. territories who are unable to obtain health insurance through their employer or a health insurance exchange to instead obtain coverage through the District of Columbia exchange, including coverage that is available to Members of Congress and their staff.
Title
Territories Health Equity Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1773 (Related) 2019-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3634 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6495 (Related) 2020-04-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB3634 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6495 (Related) 2020-04-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
American Samoa
Caribbean area
Child health
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Guam
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hospital care
Income tax credits
Medicaid
Medicare
Northern Mariana Islands
Poverty and welfare assistance
Prescription drugs
Puerto Rico
Small business
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
U.S. territories and protectorates
User charges and fees
Virgin Islands
Caribbean area
Child health
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Guam
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hospital care
Income tax credits
Medicaid
Medicare
Northern Mariana Islands
Poverty and welfare assistance
Prescription drugs
Puerto Rico
Small business
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
U.S. territories and protectorates
User charges and fees
Virgin Islands
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1354/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1354/BILLS-116hr1354ih.pdf |