US HB1366 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
U.S. Territories Investor Protection Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Investment Company Act of 1940 to apply the Act to investment companies created under the laws of Puerto Rico, the Virgin Islands, or any other U.S. possession.
Title
U.S. Territories Investor Protection Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] |
Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2017-05-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-05-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2982) |
2017-05-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1366. |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2981-2983) |
2017-05-01 | House | Mr. Hill moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 60. |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-103. |
2017-03-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 58 - 0. |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2429 (Related) 2017-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB484 (Same As) 2017-09-12 - Held at the desk.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2873 (Related) 2018-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3256 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5975 (Related) 2018-05-25 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB484 (Same As) 2017-09-12 - Held at the desk.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2873 (Related) 2018-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3256 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5975 (Related) 2018-05-25 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Caribbean area
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Puerto Rico
Securities
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Caribbean area
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Puerto Rico
Securities
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands