US HB1374 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 83-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Arbitration Fairness Act of 2017 This bill prohibits a predispute arbitration agreement from being valid or enforceable if it requires arbitration of an employment, consumer, antitrust, or civil rights dispute. The validity and enforceability of an agreement to arbitrate shall be determined by a court, under federal law, rather than an arbitrator, irrespective of whether the party resisting arbitration challenges the arbitration agreement specifically or in conjunction with other terms of the contract containing such agreement. Nothing in this bill applies to arbitration provisions in a contract between an employer and a labor organization or between labor organizations, except that no such arbitration provision shall have the effect of waiving the right of an employee to seek judicial enforcement of a right arising under the U.S. Constitution, a state constitution, a federal or state statute, or related public policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Arbitration Fairness Act of 2017

Sponsors

Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. John Conyers [D-MI]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. John Delaney [D-MD]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]
Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV]Rep. Gene Green [D-TX]
Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]
Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA]
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL]
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
2017-03-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB537 (Same As) 2017-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4570 (Related) 2018-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
SB2203 (Related) 2017-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2591 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback