US HB1381 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 32.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 32.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes specified individuals to update the burn pit registry with the cause of death of a registered individual. The Department of Veterans Affairs established the burn pit registry to allow certain veterans and servicemembers to document their exposures and report health concerns. The registry is for individuals who may have been exposed to toxic airborne chemicals and fumes caused by open burn pits (areas used for burning solid waste in open air without equipment) while deployed in Afghanistan or Iraq. Specifically, the bill authorizes a designee of a registered individual or an immediate family member to update the registry with the cause of death of the individual.
Title
Burn Pit Registry Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 104 (Y: 416 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 32. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2019-03-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-03-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 0 (Roll no. 104). (text: CR H2332) |
2019-03-05 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2340-2341) |
2019-03-05 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-03-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1381. |
2019-03-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2332-2335) |
2019-03-05 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB554 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Afghanistan
Air quality
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Fires
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health information and medical records
Iraq
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Solid waste and recycling
Veterans' medical care
Air quality
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Fires
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health information and medical records
Iraq
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Solid waste and recycling
Veterans' medical care