US HB1382 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2733)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2733)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Inaugural Fund Integrity Act limits donations to inaugural committees. Inaugural committees may not solicit, accept, or receive donations from foreign nationals or persons who are not individuals. An individual may not make a donation in the name of another individual or authorize his or her name to be used to make such a donation. Foreign nationals may not make donations or make promises to make donations to inaugural committees. The bill caps the amount an individual may donate to an inaugural committee. Donations to inaugural committees may not be converted to personal use. Inaugural committees must report information on donations and disbursements to the Federal Election Commission.
Title
Inaugural Fund Integrity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] |
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2733) |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1382/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1382/BILLS-116hr1382ih.pdf |