US HB1386 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 28.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 28.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes several changes to the navigator program for health insurance exchanges (a program through which entities receive funding to provide education and enrollment assistance). Specifically, the bill addresses certain funding decisions and regulatory actions taken by the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS). For example, the bill increases funding for navigators in federally facilitated exchanges (FFEs) beginning in FY2020. (The CMS decreased annual funding for FFE navigators for the 2017-2018 and 2018-2019 program years.) The bill also counters guidance issued by the CMS regarding navigator criteria by requiring FFE navigators to be chosen without regard to how the entity provides information on association health plans or short-term, limited-duration insurance. The bill also reinstates certain requirements that were removed by the CMS in 2018. Specifically, the bill requires (1) at least two navigators in each FFE, including at least one community and consumer-focused nonprofit group; and (2) that navigators be physically present in the state where the exchange is located.
Title
ENROLL Act of 2019 Expand Navigators’ Resources for Outreach, Learning, and Longevity Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] |
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 28. |
2019-05-03 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-50. |
2019-04-03 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 30 - 22. |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-03-27 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1884 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB987 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1905 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB1425 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 523.
SB4521 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB987 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1905 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB1425 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 523.
SB4521 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Consumer affairs
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Tax-exempt organizations
User charges and fees
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Tax-exempt organizations
User charges and fees