US HB1388 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 166.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Lytton Rancheria Homelands Act of 2019 This bill takes into trust for the benefit of the Lytton Rancheria of California certain land owned by the tribe in Sonoma County, California. Land taken into trust shall be part of the tribe's reservation. Gaming is prohibited on land taken into trust by this bill, and on lands taken into trust for the benefit of the tribe in the future. The memorandum of agreement entered into by the tribe and the county is not subject to review or approval by the Department of the Interior.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lytton Rancheria Homelands Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 128 (Y: 404 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-29SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 166.
2019-07-29SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-67.
2019-06-19SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-03-27SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
2019-03-26HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-03-26HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 404 - 21 (Roll no. 128). (text: CR H2812-2813)
2019-03-26HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2815-2816)
2019-03-26HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-03-26HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1388.
2019-03-26HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2812-2813)
2019-03-26HouseMr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-03-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2019-02-27HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2500 (Related) 2019-07-12 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 2500.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback