US HB139 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 550.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 550.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Interior to conduct a special resource study of the archeological site near Madison Street and the 10th Street Rail Corridor and other sites in Springfield, Illinois, associated with the 1908 Springfield Race Riot. Interior shall (1) evaluate the national significance of the sites, and (2) determine the suitability and feasibility of designating them as a unit of the National Park System.
Title
Springfield Race Riot Study Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 550. |
2020-09-21 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4566) |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 139. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4566-4567) |
2020-09-21 | House | Ms. Haaland moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-07-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 351. |
2020-07-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-439. |
2020-03-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-11 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2019-10-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB139 (Same As) 2019-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB298 (Related) 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 347.
SB298 (Related) 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 347.
Subjects
Historic sites and heritage areas
Illinois
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Violent crime
Illinois
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Violent crime