US HB1404 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Select Committee on Intelligence.
Pending: Senate Select Intelligence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Select Committee on Intelligence.
Pending: Senate Select Intelligence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Office of the Director of National Intelligence to report to Congress about Russian President Vladimir Putin. The report shall address topics including (1) Putin's estimated net worth and known assets; (2) methods he uses to conceal his assets, such as intermediaries and shell companies; and (3) the identities of the most significant Russian senior officials and oligarchs who help Putin hide his true financial condition.
Title
Vladimir Putin Transparency Act
Sponsors
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Select Committee on Intelligence. |
2019-03-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-03-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2662-2663) |
2019-03-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1404. |
2019-03-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2662-2664) |
2019-03-12 | House | Mrs. Demings moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3494 (Related) 2019-07-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Select Committee on Intelligence.
HR491 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR491 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign and international banking
Foreign and international corporations
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Real estate business
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign and international banking
Foreign and international corporations
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Real estate business
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status