US HB1405 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes changes to the collection and publication of statistics relating to U.S. territories and regarding reports on their economies. The Interagency Council on Statistical Policy shall collect and publish statistics regarding Puerto Rico in the same manner as statistics are collected and reported by federal agencies for the states. The Bureau of the Census shall collect and report statistics regarding Puerto Rico as part of specified statistical programs and surveys. Bureau calculations of U.S. total population must include U.S. territories. The Bureau of Economic Analysis shall include U.S. territories in its quarterly calculation of real gross domestic product by state. The National Center for Education Statistics shall collect and publish data for Puerto Rico in the same manner as for the states. The National Agricultural Statistics Service shall include Puerto Rico in its surveys. The Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration must report on efforts to include U.S. territories in the National Survey on Drug Use and Health. The National Center for Health Statistics must make available information regarding U.S. territories in the same manner as for the states. The Bureau of Justice Statistics must gather information from Puerto Rico. The Bureau of Labor Statistics shall calculate Puerto Rico's unemployment rate and inflation rate. The Federal Reserve Bank of New York shall annually update the Report on the Competitiveness of Puerto Rico's Economy. The Energy Information Administration shall annually (1) update the data and information included on its website regarding Puerto Rico, and (2) report on the cost and reliability of electric power in Puerto Rico and how that affects Puerto Rican economic growth.
Title
Puerto Rico Data Collection Equality Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, Agriculture, the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, Agriculture, the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, Agriculture, the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, Agriculture, the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, Agriculture, the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, Agriculture, the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, Agriculture, the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Agricultural research
American Samoa
Census and government statistics
Congressional oversight
Criminal justice information and records
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Economic performance and conditions
Employment and training programs
Government operations and politics
Guam
Health information and medical records
Northern Mariana Islands
Puerto Rico
Virgin Islands
Agricultural research
American Samoa
Census and government statistics
Congressional oversight
Criminal justice information and records
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Economic performance and conditions
Employment and training programs
Government operations and politics
Guam
Health information and medical records
Northern Mariana Islands
Puerto Rico
Virgin Islands
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1405/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1405/BILLS-116hr1405ih.pdf |