US HB1410 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Vietnam Human Rights Act of 2012 - Prohibits U.S. nonhumanitarian assistance to the government of Vietnam in excess of FY2011 amounts unless: (1) the federal government provides assistance, in addition to democracy building assistance under this Act, supporting human rights training, civil society building, and exchange programs between the Vietnamese National Assembly and Congress at levels commensurate with or exceeding any increases in nonhumanitarian assistance to Vietnam; and (2) the President certifies to Congress that the government of Vietnam has made substantial progress respecting political, media, and religious freedoms, minority rights, access to U.S. refugee programs, and actions to end trafficking in persons and the release of political prisoners. Authorizes the President to waive such requirements if increased U.S. nonhumanitarian assistance would promote the purposes of this Act or is otherwise in the U.S. national interest. Limits waiver authority to: (1) all U.S. nonhumanitarian assistance to Vietnam; or (2) one or more programs, projects, or activities of such assistance. Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the United States should take measures to overcome the jamming of Radio Free Asia by Vietnam and that the Broadcasting Board of Governors should not cut staffing, funding, or broadcast hours for the Vietnamese language services of the Voice of America and Radio Free Asia; and (2) U.S.-Vietnam educational and cultural exchange programs should promote freedom and democracy in Vietnam by providing opportunities to Vietnamese nationals from a wide range of occupations and perspectives to see freedom and democracy in action and, also, by ensuring that Vietnamese nationals who have demonstrated a commitment to these values are included in such programs. Sets forth reporting requirements.
Title
Vietnam Human Rights Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX] | Rep. Dan Burton [R-IN] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Howard Coble [R-NC] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. James Moran [D-VA] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] |
Rep. Loretta Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Fortney Stark [D-CA] | Rep. Frank Wolf [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2012-09-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-09-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5835-5837) |
2012-09-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1410. |
2012-09-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5835-5842) |
2012-09-11 | House | Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2012-03-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-03-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-05-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, and Human Rights. |
2011-05-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific. |
2011-04-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Subjects
Asia
Congressional oversight
Cultural exchanges and relations
Detention of persons
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
Human trafficking
Immigration status and procedures
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
News media and reporting
Political movements and philosophies
Political representation
Property rights
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Sanctions
Vietnam
Congressional oversight
Cultural exchanges and relations
Detention of persons
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
Human trafficking
Immigration status and procedures
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
News media and reporting
Political movements and philosophies
Political representation
Property rights
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Sanctions
Vietnam