US HB1416 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Pending: House Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Pending: House Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the federal government, when determining a Native American tribe's eligibility for funds, benefits, or contracts, from considering the tribe's authority to produce, purchase, or possess marijuana on tribal lands. The Indian Health Service's medical professionals may make medical recommendations to their patients with regard to marijuana.
Title
Tribal Marijuana Sovereignty Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1119 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB421 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB421 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Alternative treatments
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Federal-Indian relations
Health personnel
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Minority health
Native Americans
Alternative treatments
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Federal-Indian relations
Health personnel
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Minority health
Native Americans
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1416/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1416/BILLS-116hr1416ih.pdf |