US HB142 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Social Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Social Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows an individual diagnosed with a terminal illness to receive disability payments under the Old Age, Survivors, and Disability Insurance program during the waiting period for such payments (which typically lasts five months). It also establishes a phased-in payment schedule for such payments. These provisions shall expire January 1, 2025.
Title
Social Security Disability Fairness Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2262 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Disability assistance
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Disability assistance
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/142/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr142/BILLS-116hr142ih.pdf |