US HB1426 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-12)
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 610.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 610.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC) to address insufficient compensation of its personnel without regard to civil service laws. FERC must consult with the Office of Personnel Management when making a determination of the appropriate compensation for its personnel.
Title
Timely Review of Infrastructure Act
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] |
Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] |
Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] |
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] |
Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 610. |
2020-12-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7071-7072) |
2020-12-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1426. |
2020-12-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7071-7074) |
2020-12-09 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-12-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 510. |
2020-12-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-623. |
2020-07-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 48 - 3. |
2020-07-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-01-09 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2020-01-09 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB607 (Same As) 2019-10-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 254.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Employee hiring
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Public contracts and procurement
Employee hiring
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Public contracts and procurement