US HB1446 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-13)
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the U.S. Postal Service to sell each copy of the Multinational Species Conservation Fund Semipostal Stamp and notify Congress when all copies have been sold.
Title
Multinational Species Conservation Funds Semipostal Stamp Reauthorization Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-11-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9086) |
2019-11-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1446. |
2019-11-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9086) |
2019-11-20 | House | Mr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-11-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-285, Part I. |
2019-09-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2019-06-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB652 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Endangered and threatened species
Government operations and politics
Government trust funds
Mammals
Postal service
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Government operations and politics
Government trust funds
Mammals
Postal service
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection