US HB1451 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a new criminal offense for conduct (or attempted conduct) to corruptly hinder, interfere with, or prevent another person from registering to vote or helping someone register to vote. A violator is subject to criminal penalties—a fine, a prison term of not more than five years, or both. The Election Assistance Commission must develop best practices for states to deter and prevent unlawful interference with voter registration.
Title
Alice Paul Voter Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB1275 (Related) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB549 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1275 (Related) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB549 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Election Assistance Commission
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government information and archives
Voting rights
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Election Assistance Commission
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government information and archives
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1451/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1451/BILLS-116hr1451ih.pdf |