US HB1462 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Defense (DOD) to periodically report to the Committee on Armed Services of the House of Representatives DOD's costs in support of presidential travel. Each such report shall include costs incurred for travel to a property owned or operated by the individual serving as President or an immediate family member of such individual.
Title
Protecting Defense Dollars Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Family relationships
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Travel and tourism
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Family relationships
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Travel and tourism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1462/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1462/BILLS-116hr1462ih.pdf |