US HB1477 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Calls for assessments of Russia's relationship with Venezuela and bars from U.S. entry aliens who have supported Venezuelan security forces on behalf of Russia. The Department of State shall report to Congress an assessment of Russia and Venezuela's security cooperation and the threat it poses to countries in the Western Hemisphere, including the United States. The State Department shall also devise a strategy to counter such a threat. The President shall report to Congress an assessment of the national security risks posed by a potential Russian acquisition of CITGO's U.S. energy infrastructure holdings. CITGO is an energy company owned by Petroleos de Venezuela (PdVSA), a Venezuelan state-owned oil company. A Russian state-owned company has extended a loan to PdVSA, and a default on that loan could result in Russian ownership of CITGO. The bill bars the entry into the United States of aliens who have worked on behalf of Russia to support Venezuelan security forces. It also revokes any current visas belonging to such individuals. The President may waive this bar as to an alien if it is in the national interest of the United States to do so.
Title
Russian-Venezuelan Threat Mitigation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] |
Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2019-03-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-03-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2781-2782) |
2019-03-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1477. |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2781-2784) |
2019-03-25 | House | Mr. Malinowski moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules. |
2019-03-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1102 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
Alliances
Collective security
Congressional oversight
Foreign property
Homeland security
Immigration status and procedures
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
Latin America
Oil and gas
Russia
Venezuela
Visas and passports
Collective security
Congressional oversight
Foreign property
Homeland security
Immigration status and procedures
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
Latin America
Oil and gas
Russia
Venezuela
Visas and passports