US HB1495 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs states to use federal tax return information to verify an individual's income eligibility for the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program, Medicaid, or the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (formerly known as the food stamp program).
Title
Income Verification Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL] |
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] |
Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support. |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB588 (Same As) 2019-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Food assistance and relief
Medicaid
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social welfare
State and local government operations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Medicaid
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social welfare
State and local government operations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1495/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1495/BILLS-116hr1495ih.pdf |