US HB1499 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 30.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting Consumer Access to Generic Drugs Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting Consumer Access to Generic Drugs Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 30.
2019-05-10HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
2019-05-10HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-52, Part I.
2019-04-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
2019-04-03HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-04-03HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-27HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2019-03-27HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-06HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-03-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB987 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2700 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback