US HB1504 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a state that changes an individual's polling place to notify the individual at least seven days before the election, or, if the change is made fewer than seven days before the election and the individual appears at the previously assigned polling place, to make every reasonable effort to enable the individual to vote.
Title
Know Your Polling Place Act
Sponsors
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1275 (Related) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB549 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
SB549 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
Subjects
Congressional elections
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
State and local government operations
Voting rights
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
State and local government operations
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1504/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1504/BILLS-116hr1504ih.pdf |