US HB1514 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Juvenile Accountability Block Grants Program Reauthorization Act of 2010 - Amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to extend through FY2014 the authorization of appropriations for the juvenile accountability block grant program.
Title
Juvenile Accountability Block Grants Program Reauthorization Act of 2010
Sponsors
Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. | |
2010-05-19 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-05-19 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 364 - 45 (Roll no. 276). (text: CR 5/18/2010 H3495) | |
2010-05-19 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3593-3594) | |
2010-05-18 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2010-05-18 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1514. | |
2010-05-18 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3495-3496) | |
2010-05-18 | Mr. Scott (VA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-08-19 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. | |
2009-03-16 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2866 (Same As) 2009-12-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Justice
Executive agency funding and structure
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
State and local finance
Department of Justice
Executive agency funding and structure
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
State and local finance