US HB1514 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the United States to sever all relations with the Muscogee (Creek) Nation of Oklahoma (i.e., Creek Nation) until the tribe complies with treaty and federal obligations. Specifically, Creek Nation must restore full tribal citizenship to those individuals who can trace their ancestry to individuals listed on the 1906 Dawes Commission Rolls for the Creek Freedmen (i.e., Creek Freedmen, Freedmen, and Black Creeks). The bill also suspends the tribe's authority to conduct gaming or administer any funds from gaming until the tribe is in compliance with all treaty and federal obligations. The bill requires the Department of the Interior to (1) coordinate with federal agencies and receive reports from such agencies; (2) submit monthly compliance reports; and (3) issue a report on the status of Freedmen in the Creek, Choctaw, Chickasaw, and Seminole Nations of Oklahoma, including their access to tribal benefits. The Department of Justice must issue a finding on whether the civil rights of the Freedmen have been violated by the Creek Nation, Interior, or both. The bill establishes a private right of action for Freedmen. The bill directs the Government Accountability Office to issue an annual report on the tribe's expenditure of federal funds and whether the tribe is in full compliance with all federal laws related to the management and disbursement of such funds.
Title
To sever United States Government relations with the Creek Nation of Oklahoma until such time as the Creek Nation of Oklahoma restores full Tribal citizenship to the Creek Freedmen disenfranchised in the October 6, 1979, Creek Nation vote and fulfills all its treaty obligations with the Government of the United States, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Federal-Indian relations
Gambling
Government studies and investigations
Indian claims
Indian social and development programs
Native Americans
Oklahoma
Congressional oversight
Federal-Indian relations
Gambling
Government studies and investigations
Indian claims
Indian social and development programs
Native Americans
Oklahoma
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1514/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1514/BILLS-116hr1514ih.pdf |