US HB1519 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CREATE Act of 2019 Comprehensive Resources for Entrepreneurs in the Arts to Transform the Economy Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CREATE Act of 2019 Comprehensive Resources for Entrepreneurs in the Arts to Transform the Economy Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-03-27HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
2019-03-06HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2019-03-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Education and Labor, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Education and Labor, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Education and Labor, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Education and Labor, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Education and Labor, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Education and Labor, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB650 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback