US HB1527 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to enter into contracts to place certain disabled veterans in medical foster homes at the request of such veterans. Specifically, the bill concerns veterans with service-connected disabilities to whom the VA is required to provide nursing home care. Medical foster homes are homes designed to provide non-institutional, long-term, supportive care for veterans who are unable to live independently and prefer a family setting. In any year, not more than a daily average of 900 veterans placed in a medical foster home may have their care covered.
Title
Long-Term Care Veterans Choice Act
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] |
Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] |
Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] |
Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-03-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-12 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2019-09-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3408 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Home and outpatient care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Public contracts and procurement
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Home and outpatient care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Public contracts and procurement
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1527/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1527/BILLS-116hr1527ih.pdf |