US HB153 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit brand name drug manufacturers from compensating generic drug manufacturers to delay the entry of a generic drug into the market, and to prohibit biological product manufacturers from compensating biosimilar and interchangeable product manufacturers to delay entry of biosimilar and interchangeable products, and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting Consumer Access to Generic Drugs Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] |
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law. |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB19 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/153/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr153/BILLS-117hr153ih.pdf |