US HB1541 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-12 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 171.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-12 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 171.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to acquire certain property related to the Fort Scott National Historic Site in Fort Scott, Kansas, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill: (1) allows the Department of the Interior to acquire the lands, buildings, and improvements known as Fort Scott for inclusion in the Fort Scott National Historic Site in Kansas only by donation; (2) repeals the proviso that the buildings so acquired shall not include the structure known as Lunette Blair; and (3) modifies the boundary of such site.
Title
To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to acquire certain property related to the Fort Scott National Historic Site in Fort Scott, Kansas, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 171. |
2017-07-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-07-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5407) |
2017-07-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1541. |
2017-07-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5407-5408) |
2017-07-11 | House | Mr. LaHood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-07-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 144. |
2017-07-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-207. |
2017-06-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB189 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 51.