US HB1545 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-10)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the requirements for determining the unrelated business taxable income of tax-exempt organizations. The bill repeals a provision that requires unrelated business taxable income to be increased by the amount of expenses paid or incurred by a tax-exempt organization for certain fringe benefits for which a tax deduction is not allowed, including benefits relating to transportation, parking, or an on-premises athletic facility.
Title
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the inclusion of certain fringe benefit expenses for which a deduction is disallowed in unrelated business taxable income.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] |
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] |
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] |
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT] |
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] |
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] |
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] |
Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] |
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB632 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB513 (Related) 2019-01-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1223 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB501 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1282 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3300 (Related) 2020-02-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 307.
HB513 (Related) 2019-01-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1223 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB501 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1282 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3300 (Related) 2020-02-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 307.
Subjects
Business expenses
Income tax rates
Sports and recreation facilities
Tax-exempt organizations
Taxation
Transportation costs
Income tax rates
Sports and recreation facilities
Tax-exempt organizations
Taxation
Transportation costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1545/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1545/BILLS-116hr1545ih.pdf |