US HB1548 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the relief of Maria Carmen Castro Ramirez and J. Refugio Carreno Rojas.
Title
For the relief of Maria Carmen Castro Ramirez and J. Refugio Carreno Rojas.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Pelosi [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-06-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-06-11 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H2379-2380) |
2020-06-11 | House | Without objection, the Chair laid before the House H.R. 1548. (consideration: CR H2379-2380) |
2020-05-22 | House | Placed on the Private Calendar, Calendar No. 1. |
2020-05-22 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-423. |
2020-03-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-10 | House | Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Discharged. |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |