US HB1568 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 194.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SAVE Right Whales Act Scientific Assistance for Very Endangered North Atlantic Right Whales Act of 2019 This bill provides support for the conservation of North Atlantic right whales (Eubalaena glacialis). Specifically, it requires the Department of Commerce to provide financial assistance for the conservation of such whales. In addition, Commerce must conduct surveys of plankton on an ongoing basis using a continuous plankton recorder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SAVE Right Whales Act Scientific Assistance for Very Endangered North Atlantic Right Whales Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-18HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 194.
2019-10-18HouseCommittee on the Budget discharged.
2019-10-18HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-244, Part I.
2019-05-01HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 13.
2019-05-01HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-01HouseSubcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
2019-03-26HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-03-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-03-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2453 (Related) 2020-08-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 519.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback