US HB1569 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Became Public Law No: 116-40.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend title 28, United States Code, to add Flagstaff and Yuma to the list of locations in which court shall be held in the judicial district for the State of Arizona. This bill adds Flagstaff and Yuma to the list of locations where court must be held in the U.S. District of Arizona.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend title 28, United States Code, to add Flagstaff and Yuma to the list of locations in which court shall be held in the judicial district for the State of Arizona.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-40.
2019-08-09SenateSigned by President.
2019-07-30SenatePresented to President.
2019-07-25SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-07-25SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5114-5115)
2019-07-11SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2019-07-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-10HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5328)
2019-07-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1569.
2019-07-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5328-5329)
2019-07-10HouseMr. Stanton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-07-09HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 105.
2019-07-09HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-142.
2019-06-12HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-06-12HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
2019-03-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-03-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB688 (Same As) 2019-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback