US HB1575 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the statute of limitations for enforcing robocall violations and authorizes the Federal Communications Commission to pursue violations of robocall rules without first issuing a citation.
Title
Robocall Enforcement Enhancement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-03-12 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2655) |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-03-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil actions and liability
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Civil actions and liability
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1575/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1575/BILLS-116hr1575ih.pdf |