US HB1588 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 92-23)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-29 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 405.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-29 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 405.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer Rental Purchase Agreement Act - (Sec. 3) Amends the Consumer Credit Protection Act to prescribe consumer protection guidelines for rental-purchase transactions, including: (1) the determination of rental-purchase cost and a payment schedule; (2) disclosure requirements; (3) prohibitions against confessions of judgment, wage assignments, waiver of consumer claims or defenses, and other specified kinds of provisions; (4) furnishing of statements of account; (5) point-of-rental disclosures; and (6) clear and conspicuous rental-purchase advertising disclosures. Shields "rental-purchase agreements" from laws regulating: (1) a credit sale and a consumer lease as defined in the Truth in Lending Act, or (2) an extension of credit or a transaction giving rise to a debt incurred in connection with the purchase of a thing of value. Exempts from jurisdiction of this Act rental-purchase agreements primarily for business, commercial, or agricultural purposes, or those made with government agencies or instrumentalities. Declares that the consumer shall acquire ownership of a property that is the subject of the rental-purchase agreement, and the rental-purchase agreement shall terminate, upon the consumer's compliance with specified total cost payment requirements ,or any early payment option provided in the rental purchase agreement, and upon payment of any past due payments and fees. Grants federal district courts jurisdiction over actions brought under this Act. Permits an action for civil liability against a merchant's assignee only if the violation is apparent on the face of a rental-purchase agreement to which it relates, including, but not limited to, a disclosure that can be determined to be incomplete or inaccurate from the face of the agreement. Authorizes the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System to promulgate implementing regulations. Grants enforcement powers to the Federal Trade Commission (FTC) and to state attorneys general. Subjects to criminal penalties any willful and knowing violation of the information disclosure requirements of this Act. Provides that a term or provision of state law is not inconsistent with this Act if it affords greater protection and benefit to the consumer than is provided under this Act as determined by the Board, on its own motion or upon the petition of any interested party. Declares this Act to supersede state law to the extent that such law: (1) regulates a rental-purchase agreement as a security interest, credit sale, retail installment sale, conditional sale or any other form of consumer credit, or that imputes to a rental-purchase agreement the creation of a debt or extension of credit; or (2) requires the disclosure of a percentage rate calculation, including a time-price differential, an annual percentage rate, or an effective annual percentage rate. Shields from civil or criminal liability under this Act the United States and its departments or agencies, and any state, state agency, or state political subdivision.
Title
Consumer Rental Purchase Agreement Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 405. |
2012-06-29 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 112-565. |
2012-05-31 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 21. |
2012-05-31 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-11-17 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2011-11-17 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-07-26 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2011-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit. |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB881 (Related) 2011-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Contracts and agency
Evidence and witnesses
Federal preemption
Federal Reserve System
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Finance and financial sector
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Small business
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Contracts and agency
Evidence and witnesses
Federal preemption
Federal Reserve System
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Finance and financial sector
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Small business